THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:22:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4300 Steeles Avenue East
Unit F33
Markham Ontario L3R 0N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056047889
Fax: 9056047890

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 Oct 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jing Cao Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Cao (CPSO#: 96993 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4300 Steeles Avenue East
Unit F33
Markham Ontario L3R 0N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056047889
Fax: 9056047890

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 Oct 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jing Cao Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Cao (CPSO#: 96993 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JING CAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JING CAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Oct 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Nov 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Oct 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jan 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2011