THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:18:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Athens, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 University Avenue Suite 6-614
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Toronto Ontario M5G 1Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-4501
Extension: 4013
Fax: (416) 946-4407

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 01 Apr 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 01 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michelis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 May 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Michelis (CPSO#: 97052 )
Business Address: UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Medical Oncology and Hematology
610 University Avenue
OPG - 6-614
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-4501 Extn: 4013

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK
Medical School: University of Athens, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 University Avenue Suite 6-614
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Toronto Ontario M5G 1Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-4501
Extension: 4013
Fax: (416) 946-4407

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 01 Apr 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 01 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michelis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 May 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Michelis (CPSO#: 97052 )
Business Address: UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Medical Oncology and Hematology
610 University Avenue
OPG - 6-614
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-4501 Extn: 4013

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
11 Jan 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 11 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. FOTIOS MICHELIS may practise medicine independently in Hematology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. FOTIOS MICHELIS may practise medicine independently in Hematology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Athens, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Jan 2024
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 17 Feb 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Mar 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 22 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2024

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 17 Feb 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Feb 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Nov 2011