THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:54:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dow Medical College, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 14-15
1145 Morningside Avenue
Toronto Ontario M1B 0A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 352-3621
Fax: (647) 352-3628
Address: 2860 Denison Street
UNITS 101-102
Markham Ontario L3S 4T6
Phone: 905-554-0441
Fax: 647-352-3628

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 May 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 28 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. B. Arif Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Arif (CPSO#: 97077 )
Business Address: 1145 Morningside Avenue
Suite 14/15
Toronto Ontario M1B 0A7
(647) 352-3621

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: Dow Medical College, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 14-15
1145 Morningside Avenue
Toronto Ontario M1B 0A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 352-3621
Fax: (647) 352-3628
Address: 2860 Denison Street
UNITS 101-102
Markham Ontario L3S 4T6
Phone: 905-554-0441
Fax: 647-352-3628

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 May 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 28 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. B. Arif Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Arif (CPSO#: 97077 )
Business Address: 1145 Morningside Avenue
Suite 14/15
Toronto Ontario M1B 0A7
(647) 352-3621

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
12 Jul 2013
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 12 2013
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Beenish Arif may practise medicine independently in family medicine, and as
a hospitalist, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Beenish Arif may practise medicine independently in family medicine, and as
a hospitalist, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dow Medical College, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 05 Oct 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 05 Oct 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2011