THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 09:45:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Dundee, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN, MALTESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1338 Fourth Ave
St. Catharines ON L2S 0G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289 267 0478
Fax: 905 687 9394

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joseph George Zammit-Maempel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Dec 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Zammit-Maempel (CPSO#: 97091 )
Business Address: Niagara Family Health Centre
1338 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0G1
(905) 984-3335

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN, MALTESE
Medical School: University of Dundee, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1338 Fourth Ave
St. Catharines ON L2S 0G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289 267 0478
Fax: 905 687 9394

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joseph George Zammit-Maempel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Dec 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Zammit-Maempel (CPSO#: 97091 )
Business Address: Niagara Family Health Centre
1338 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0G1
(905) 984-3335

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSEPH GEORGE ZAMMIT-MAEMPEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAMMIT-MAEMPEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSEPH GEORGE ZAMMIT-MAEMPEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAMMIT-MAEMPEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Dundee, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 May 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 May 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 29 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Mar 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 May 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 May 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 May 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Dec 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Dec 2011