THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 06:08:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: The Hebrew University-Hadassah Medical School, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave.
M4 wing
NICU
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 4164806055
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Paediatrics
555 University Avenue
Room 1436
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-5710
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 17 Feb 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 17 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Asaph Rolnitsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rolnitsky (CPSO#: 97093 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
M4 Wing NICU
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6055

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW
Medical School: The Hebrew University-Hadassah Medical School, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave.
M4 wing
NICU
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 4164806055
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Paediatrics
555 University Avenue
Room 1436
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-5710
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 17 Feb 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 17 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Asaph Rolnitsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rolnitsky (CPSO#: 97093 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
M4 Wing NICU
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6055

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
17 Feb 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 17 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ASAPH ROLNITSKY may practise medicine independently in Neonatology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ASAPH ROLNITSKY may practise medicine independently in Neonatology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: The Hebrew University-Hadassah Medical School, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 17 Feb 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 04 Jan 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Oct 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Feb 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 17 Feb 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Nov 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Nov 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Feb 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Feb 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Feb 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Feb 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2011