THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:15:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of The West Indies,Trinidad, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Streetsville Medical Centre
Unit 8
5425 Creditview Road
Mississauga Ontario L5V 2P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 826-1164
Fax: (905) 826-1214

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jul 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 05 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. V. Persad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Persad (CPSO#: 97105 )
Business Address: Streetsville Medical Centre
8 - 5425 Creditview Road
Mississauga Ontario L5V 2P3
(905) 826-1164

Corporation Name: Dr. Vashti Persad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Apr 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Persad (CPSO#: 97105 )
Business Address: 1060 Eglinton Avenue East
Mississauga Ontario L4W 1K3
(905) 624-1511
Business Address: 2930 Erin Centre Boulevard
Mississauga Ontario L5M 7M4
(905) 569-7155
Business Address: 1742 Bristol Road West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 1X9
(905) 826-3045
Business Address: Streetsville Medical Centre
Unit 8
5425 Creditview Road
Mississauga Ontario L5V 2P3
(905) 826-1164

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of The West Indies,Trinidad, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Streetsville Medical Centre
Unit 8
5425 Creditview Road
Mississauga Ontario L5V 2P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 826-1164
Fax: (905) 826-1214

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jul 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 05 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. V. Persad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Persad (CPSO#: 97105 )
Business Address: Streetsville Medical Centre
8 - 5425 Creditview Road
Mississauga Ontario L5V 2P3
(905) 826-1164

Corporation Name: Dr. Vashti Persad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Apr 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Persad (CPSO#: 97105 )
Business Address: 1060 Eglinton Avenue East
Mississauga Ontario L4W 1K3
(905) 624-1511
Business Address: 2930 Erin Centre Boulevard
Mississauga Ontario L5M 7M4
(905) 569-7155
Business Address: 1742 Bristol Road West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 1X9
(905) 826-3045
Business Address: Streetsville Medical Centre
Unit 8
5425 Creditview Road
Mississauga Ontario L5V 2P3
(905) 826-1164

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VASHTI CHANARDAYE PERSAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERSAD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VASHTI CHANARDAYE PERSAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERSAD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of The West Indies,Trinidad, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Jan 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2011