THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:16:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: Oduwole, Queenette (Used Until: 19 Jul 2018)
Medical School: University of Calabar, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 125 Keil Drive South
Chatham Ontario N7M 3H3
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 2269962255
Fax: 5193556067
Address: 325 MARGARET AVE
WALLACEBURG
Chatham Ontario N8A 2A7
Phone: 5193526400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 125 Keil Drive South
Chatham Ontario N7M 3H3
Phone: 2269962255
Fax: 5193556067

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Queenette Asuquo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. Q. Asuquo (CPSO#: 97115 )
Business Address: 125 Keil Drive South
Chatham Ontario N7M 3H3
226 996 2255

Corporation Name: Queenette Oduwole Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Jul 2013

General Information

Former Name: Oduwole, Queenette (Used Until: 19 Jul 2018)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calabar, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 125 Keil Drive South
Chatham Ontario N7M 3H3
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 2269962255
Fax: 5193556067
Address: 325 MARGARET AVE
WALLACEBURG
Chatham Ontario N8A 2A7
Phone: 5193526400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 125 Keil Drive South
Chatham Ontario N7M 3H3
Phone: 2269962255
Fax: 5193556067

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Queenette Asuquo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. Q. Asuquo (CPSO#: 97115 )
Business Address: 125 Keil Drive South
Chatham Ontario N7M 3H3
226 996 2255

Corporation Name: Queenette Oduwole Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Jul 2013

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. QUEENETTE ASUQUO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASUQUO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. QUEENETTE ASUQUO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASUQUO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calabar, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 May 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 08 Jan 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 May 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 08 Jan 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Dec 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Dec 2011