THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:53:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Dundee, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart Street
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Hematology
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6135496666
Extension: 7404
Fax: 6135482470
Address: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
KGH Site
Division of Hematology
94 Stuart St
Kingston Ontario K7L 3N6
Phone: (613) 533-2946
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Cancer Research Institute
10 Stuart St
Kingston Ontario K7L 3N6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 01 Jul 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Annette Hay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 May 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hay (CPSO#: 97154 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Division of Hematology
Burr 2
25 King Street West
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 544-2631
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Divison of Hematology
94 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 3N6
(613) 533-2946
Business Address: Cancer Research Institute
10 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 3N6
(613) 533-6430

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Dundee, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart Street
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Hematology
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6135496666
Extension: 7404
Fax: 6135482470
Address: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
KGH Site
Division of Hematology
94 Stuart St
Kingston Ontario K7L 3N6
Phone: (613) 533-2946
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Cancer Research Institute
10 Stuart St
Kingston Ontario K7L 3N6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 01 Jul 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Annette Hay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 May 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hay (CPSO#: 97154 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Division of Hematology
Burr 2
25 King Street West
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 544-2631
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Divison of Hematology
94 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 3N6
(613) 533-2946
Business Address: Cancer Research Institute
10 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 3N6
(613) 533-6430

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
15 Jun 2020
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jun 15 2020
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Annette Elizabeth Hay may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
Division of Hematology, Queen's University, in which Dr. Hay holds
an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Hay no
longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.


VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Annette Elizabeth Hay may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
Division of Hematology, Queen's University, in which Dr. Hay holds
an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Hay no
longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.


Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Dundee, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 15 Jun 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 06 Apr 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2012
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Mar 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 2012