THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/04/25 08:56:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 108-21 Surrey St W
Guelph ON N1H 3R3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-314-2100
Fax: 888-570-0492

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 Jan 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 05 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Danescu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Danescu (CPSO#: 97163 )
Business Address: Suite 308
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C1
(519) 744-1785
Business Address: 108-21 Surrey St W
Guelph ON N1H 3R3
226-314-2100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN
Medical School: University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 108-21 Surrey St W
Guelph ON N1H 3R3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-314-2100
Fax: 888-570-0492

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 Jan 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 05 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Danescu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Danescu (CPSO#: 97163 )
Business Address: Suite 308
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C1
(519) 744-1785
Business Address: 108-21 Surrey St W
Guelph ON N1H 3R3
226-314-2100

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
07 Jan 2019
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 07 2019
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1 of 2)
As from January 7, 2019, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Septimiu Cristian
Danescu, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Danescu to
the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
("Undertaking")

of

DR. SEPTIMIU CRISTIAN DANESCU
("Dr. Danescu")

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")



A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
amended;

"ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
the College;

"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
public.

(2) I, Dr. Danescu, certificate of registration number 97163, am a member of
the College.

(3) I, Dr. Danescu, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation
bearing File Number 105407 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my internal medicine
practice.

(4) I, Dr. Danescu, acknowledge that, if an original copy of this Undertaking
as signed by me is accepted by the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports
Committee, the College will also deliver a caution in person.

B. UNDERTAKING

(5) I, Dr. Danescu, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
effective upon the date this Undertaking is approved by the ICR Committee
("Effective Date").

(6) Professional Education

(a) I, Dr. Danescu, undertake to participate in and successfully
complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
Appendix "A", including all of the following professional education
(the "Professional Education"):

(i) a program satisfactory to the College in medical
record-keeping;

(ii) review the College Policy "Medical Records":
http://www.cpso.on.ca/Policies-Publications/Policy/Medical-Records;
and

(iii) review and prepare a written summary regarding patients
presenting with decreased level of consciousness, including
the role of glucose testing and administration of dextrose.

(b) I, Dr. Danescu, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
successful completion of the Professional Education, including
proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
successfully completed the Professional Education.

(c) I, Dr. Danescu, undertake to complete this requirement by March 1,
2019 or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time, by
the first possible opportunity thereafter.

(d) I, Dr. Danescu, acknowledge that a report or reports may be
provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with
the Professional Education.

(7) Change of Scope/Re-Entering Practice

(a) I, Dr. Danescu, acknowledge that I have not practiced in-patient
internal medicine since November 2016.

(b) I, Dr. Danescu, undertake that, prior to resuming practice in
in-patient internal medicine, I will report to the College and
comply with the process set out in the College's Policy on Ensuring
Competence: Changing Scope of Practice and/or Re-Entering Practice
attached hereto as Appendix "B".

(8) Monitoring

(a) I, Dr. Danescu, undertake to inform the College of each and every
location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
(collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward,
I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
that location.

(b) I, Dr. Danescu, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c) I, Dr. Danescu, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Danescu, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form
attached hereto as Appendix "C".

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(9) I, Dr. Danescu, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(10) I, Dr. Danescu, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
Undertaking.

(11) I, Dr. Danescu, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
right to do so.

(12) I, Dr. Danescu, acknowledge that the College will provide this
Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs
of Staff").

(13) I, Dr. Danescu, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
the Discipline Committee of the College.

(14) I, Dr. Danescu, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(15) Public Register

(a) I, Dr. Danescu, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
the Public Register.

(b) I, Dr. Danescu, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the
following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr.
Danescu engaged in professional misconduct and/or is
incompetent in his internal medicine practice.

Dr. Danescu has not practiced in-patient internal medicine
since November 2016. Prior to resuming practice in
in-patient internal medicine, Dr. Danescu shall report to the
College and comply with the process set out in the College's
Policy on Ensuring Competence: Changing Scope of Practice
and/or Re-Entering Practice.
As a result of the investigation, Dr. Danescu will engage in
professional education in medical record-keeping and clinical
care issues.

(c) I, Dr. Danescu, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect
until the College determines its terms are satisfied.

D. CONSENT

(16) I, Dr. Danescu, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
following information to any person who requires this information for the
purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education:

(a) any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
entering into this Undertaking;

(b) any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
of, my practice; and

(c) any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
Undertaking.

(17) I, Dr. Danescu, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(18) I, Dr. Danescu, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
my completion of the Professional Education and Chiefs of Staff, to
disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:

(a) any information relevant to this Undertaking;

(b) any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
compliance with this Undertaking; and/or

(c) any information which comes to their attention in the course of
providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably
believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

(2 of 2)

As from January 30, 2014, by order of the Registration Committee of the College
of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following term, condition and
limitation is imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Septimiu
Cristian Danescu:

Dr. Septimiu Cristian Danescu may practise medicine independently in
internal medicine, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1 of 2)
As from January 7, 2019, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Septimiu Cristian
Danescu, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Danescu to
the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
("Undertaking")

of

DR. SEPTIMIU CRISTIAN DANESCU
("Dr. Danescu")

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")



A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
amended;

"ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
the College;

"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
public.

(2) I, Dr. Danescu, certificate of registration number 97163, am a member of
the College.

(3) I, Dr. Danescu, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation
bearing File Number 105407 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my internal medicine
practice.

(4) I, Dr. Danescu, acknowledge that, if an original copy of this Undertaking
as signed by me is accepted by the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports
Committee, the College will also deliver a caution in person.

B. UNDERTAKING

(5) I, Dr. Danescu, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
effective upon the date this Undertaking is approved by the ICR Committee
("Effective Date").

(6) Professional Education

(a) I, Dr. Danescu, undertake to participate in and successfully
complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
Appendix "A", including all of the following professional education
(the "Professional Education"):

(i) a program satisfactory to the College in medical
record-keeping;

(ii) review the College Policy "Medical Records":
http://www.cpso.on.ca/Policies-Publications/Policy/Medical-Records;
and

(iii) review and prepare a written summary regarding patients
presenting with decreased level of consciousness, including
the role of glucose testing and administration of dextrose.

(b) I, Dr. Danescu, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
successful completion of the Professional Education, including
proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
successfully completed the Professional Education.

(c) I, Dr. Danescu, undertake to complete this requirement by March 1,
2019 or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time, by
the first possible opportunity thereafter.

(d) I, Dr. Danescu, acknowledge that a report or reports may be
provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with
the Professional Education.

(7) Change of Scope/Re-Entering Practice

(a) I, Dr. Danescu, acknowledge that I have not practiced in-patient
internal medicine since November 2016.

(b) I, Dr. Danescu, undertake that, prior to resuming practice in
in-patient internal medicine, I will report to the College and
comply with the process set out in the College's Policy on Ensuring
Competence: Changing Scope of Practice and/or Re-Entering Practice
attached hereto as Appendix "B".

(8) Monitoring

(a) I, Dr. Danescu, undertake to inform the College of each and every
location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
(collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward,
I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
that location.

(b) I, Dr. Danescu, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c) I, Dr. Danescu, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Danescu, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form
attached hereto as Appendix "C".

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(9) I, Dr. Danescu, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(10) I, Dr. Danescu, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
Undertaking.

(11) I, Dr. Danescu, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
right to do so.

(12) I, Dr. Danescu, acknowledge that the College will provide this
Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs
of Staff").

(13) I, Dr. Danescu, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
the Discipline Committee of the College.

(14) I, Dr. Danescu, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(15) Public Register

(a) I, Dr. Danescu, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
the Public Register.

(b) I, Dr. Danescu, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the
following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr.
Danescu engaged in professional misconduct and/or is
incompetent in his internal medicine practice.

Dr. Danescu has not practiced in-patient internal medicine
since November 2016. Prior to resuming practice in
in-patient internal medicine, Dr. Danescu shall report to the
College and comply with the process set out in the College's
Policy on Ensuring Competence: Changing Scope of Practice
and/or Re-Entering Practice.
As a result of the investigation, Dr. Danescu will engage in
professional education in medical record-keeping and clinical
care issues.

(c) I, Dr. Danescu, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect
until the College determines its terms are satisfied.

D. CONSENT

(16) I, Dr. Danescu, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
following information to any person who requires this information for the
purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education:

(a) any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
entering into this Undertaking;

(b) any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
of, my practice; and

(c) any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
Undertaking.

(17) I, Dr. Danescu, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(18) I, Dr. Danescu, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
my completion of the Professional Education and Chiefs of Staff, to
disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:

(a) any information relevant to this Undertaking;

(b) any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
compliance with this Undertaking; and/or

(c) any information which comes to their attention in the course of
providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably
believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

(2 of 2)

As from January 30, 2014, by order of the Registration Committee of the College
of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following term, condition and
limitation is imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Septimiu
Cristian Danescu:

Dr. Septimiu Cristian Danescu may practise medicine independently in
internal medicine, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 07 Jan 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person. 


Source: Member
Effective Date: 07 Jan 2019
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Septimiu Cristian Danescu to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 7, 2019:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Danescu engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his internal medicine practice.

Dr. Danescu has not practiced in-patient internal medicine since November 2016. Prior to resuming practice in in-patient internal medicine, Dr. Danescu shall report to the College and comply with the process set out in the College’s Policy on Ensuring Competence: Changing Scope of Practice and/or Re-Entering Practice.

As a result of the investigation, Dr. Danescu will engage in professional education in medical record-keeping and clinical care issues. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 07 Jan 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person. 


Source: Member
Effective Date: 07 Jan 2019
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Septimiu Cristian Danescu to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 7, 2019:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Danescu engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his internal medicine practice.

Dr. Danescu has not practiced in-patient internal medicine since November 2016. Prior to resuming practice in in-patient internal medicine, Dr. Danescu shall report to the College and comply with the process set out in the College’s Policy on Ensuring Competence: Changing Scope of Practice and/or Re-Entering Practice.

As a result of the investigation, Dr. Danescu will engage in professional education in medical record-keeping and clinical care issues. 

Training

Medical School: University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 07 Jan 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 30 Jan 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 07 Jan 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 30 Jan 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jan 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Jan 2012