THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:47:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Shiraz University, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AZARI, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Port Arthur Health Clinic
194 Court St.N
Thunder Bay Ontario P7A 4V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807)346-1000
Extension: 7756
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 23 Dec 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 23 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Reza Golrokhian Sani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Golrokhian Sani (CPSO#: 97179 )
Business Address: Port Arthur Health Clinic
194 Courth Street North
Thunder Bay Ontario P7A 4V7
(807) 346-1000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AZARI, FARSI
Medical School: Shiraz University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Port Arthur Health Clinic
194 Court St.N
Thunder Bay Ontario P7A 4V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807)346-1000
Extension: 7756
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 23 Dec 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 23 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Reza Golrokhian Sani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Golrokhian Sani (CPSO#: 97179 )
Business Address: Port Arthur Health Clinic
194 Courth Street North
Thunder Bay Ontario P7A 4V7
(807) 346-1000

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
10 Aug 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 10 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MOHAMMAD REZA GOLROKHIAN SANI may practise medicine independently in Otolaryngology- Head and Neck Surgery.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MOHAMMAD REZA GOLROKHIAN SANI may practise medicine independently in Otolaryngology- Head and Neck Surgery.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 24 Feb 2023
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 24 Feb 2023
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:

Training

Medical School: Shiraz University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 10 Aug 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Jan 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2028

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Dec 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Dec 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Mar 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jan 2012