THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:36:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5-595 Ontario Rd
Welland ON L3B 0B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-876-9086
Fax: 1-833-478-1504
Address: 380 Elm St
Bridges Community Health Centre
Port Colborne ON L3K 4P2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2763 Stevensville Rd
Unit 4
Stevensville ON L0S 1S0
Phone: 289-876-9086
Fax: 1-833-478-1504

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Oct 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 25 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Susini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jan 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Susini (CPSO#: 97186 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5-595 Ontario Rd
Welland ON L3B 0B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-876-9086
Fax: 1-833-478-1504
Address: 380 Elm St
Bridges Community Health Centre
Port Colborne ON L3K 4P2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2763 Stevensville Rd
Unit 4
Stevensville ON L0S 1S0
Phone: 289-876-9086
Fax: 1-833-478-1504

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Oct 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 25 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Susini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jan 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Susini (CPSO#: 97186 )

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
10 Aug 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 10 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from January 10, 2020, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Vincenzo Rocco Susini in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Susini to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
("Undertaking")

of

DR. VINCENZO ROCCO SUSINI
("Dr. Susini")

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")

A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;

"Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;

"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public.

(2) I, Dr. Susini, certificate of registration number 97186, am a member of the College.

(3) I, Dr. Susini, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation bearing File Number 1108978 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my emergency medicine practice.

B. UNDERTAKING

(4) I, Dr. Susini, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(5) Practice Restriction

(a) I, Dr. Susini, undertake that I will not engage in the practice of emergency medicine. I further undertake not to practise medicine in any urgent care centre that is affiliated with a hospital.




(6) Monitoring

(a) I, Dr. Susini, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, institutions and any Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(b) I, Dr. Susini, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient charts by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c) I, Dr. Susini, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Susini, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix "A".

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(7) I, Dr. Susini, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(8) I, Dr. Susini, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(9) I, Dr. Susini, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(10) I, Dr. Susini, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

(11) I, Dr. Susini, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee.

(12) I, Dr. Susini, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(13) Public Register

(a) I, Dr. Susini, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b) I, Dr. Susini, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (13)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Susini engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in his emergency medicine practice. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Susini must not practice emergency medicine and must not work in any urgent care centre that is affiliated with a hospital.

D. CONSENT

(14) I, Dr. Susini, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

The certificate of registration held by Dr. Vincenzo Rocco Susini also carries the following term, condition and limitation imposed by the Registration Committee, effective June 24, 2016.

Dr. Vincenzo Rocco Susini may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from January 10, 2020, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Vincenzo Rocco Susini in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Susini to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
("Undertaking")

of

DR. VINCENZO ROCCO SUSINI
("Dr. Susini")

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")

A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;

"Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;

"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public.

(2) I, Dr. Susini, certificate of registration number 97186, am a member of the College.

(3) I, Dr. Susini, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation bearing File Number 1108978 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my emergency medicine practice.

B. UNDERTAKING

(4) I, Dr. Susini, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(5) Practice Restriction

(a) I, Dr. Susini, undertake that I will not engage in the practice of emergency medicine. I further undertake not to practise medicine in any urgent care centre that is affiliated with a hospital.




(6) Monitoring

(a) I, Dr. Susini, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, institutions and any Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(b) I, Dr. Susini, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient charts by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c) I, Dr. Susini, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Susini, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix "A".

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(7) I, Dr. Susini, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(8) I, Dr. Susini, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(9) I, Dr. Susini, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(10) I, Dr. Susini, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

(11) I, Dr. Susini, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee.

(12) I, Dr. Susini, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(13) Public Register

(a) I, Dr. Susini, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b) I, Dr. Susini, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (13)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Susini engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in his emergency medicine practice. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Susini must not practice emergency medicine and must not work in any urgent care centre that is affiliated with a hospital.

D. CONSENT

(14) I, Dr. Susini, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

The certificate of registration held by Dr. Vincenzo Rocco Susini also carries the following term, condition and limitation imposed by the Registration Committee, effective June 24, 2016.

Dr. Vincenzo Rocco Susini may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: FSMB (USA)
Notice Type: External Findings - Other Regulatory Body
Effective Date: 23 Sep 2020
Summary:
The following are disciplinary findings made by other regulatory bodies against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

On September 23, 2020, the Disciplinary Subcommittee of the Michigan Board of Medicine found that Dr. Susini had violated the Michigan Public Health Code as a result of the adverse action taken by the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (an undertaking entered into by Dr. Susini with CPSO in January 2020 which restricted his practice of medicine in Ontario) and by failing to notify the Michigan Department of Licensing and Regulation Affairs of such action. The Michigan Disciplinary Subcommittee ordered that Dr. Susini pay a fine of $2000 and not engage in the practice of medicine in the state of Michigan until he verifies that the Undertaking he entered into with CPSO has been removed from his Ontario medical license. The College was notified of this finding by a report from FSMB dated November 30, 2020. 


Source: Member
Effective Date: 10 Jan 2020
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Vincenzo Rocco Susini to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 10, 2020:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Susini engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in his emergency medicine practice. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Susini must not practise emergency medicine and must not work in any urgent care centre that is affiliated with a hospital. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: FSMB (USA)
Notice Type: External Findings - Other Regulatory Body
Effective Date: 23 Sep 2020
Summary:
The following are disciplinary findings made by other regulatory bodies against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

On September 23, 2020, the Disciplinary Subcommittee of the Michigan Board of Medicine found that Dr. Susini had violated the Michigan Public Health Code as a result of the adverse action taken by the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (an undertaking entered into by Dr. Susini with CPSO in January 2020 which restricted his practice of medicine in Ontario) and by failing to notify the Michigan Department of Licensing and Regulation Affairs of such action. The Michigan Disciplinary Subcommittee ordered that Dr. Susini pay a fine of $2000 and not engage in the practice of medicine in the state of Michigan until he verifies that the Undertaking he entered into with CPSO has been removed from his Ontario medical license. The College was notified of this finding by a report from FSMB dated November 30, 2020. 


Source: Member
Effective Date: 10 Jan 2020
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Vincenzo Rocco Susini to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 10, 2020:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Susini engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in his emergency medicine practice. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Susini must not practise emergency medicine and must not work in any urgent care centre that is affiliated with a hospital. 

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2022
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 09 Aug 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 10 Jan 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 24 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Dec 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 10 Jan 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2020

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2012