THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:46:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 32 Munger Avenue West
Harrow ON N0R 1G0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 738-3555
Fax: (519) 738-3990
Address: 1 Pollard drive
Harrow Ontario N0R1G0
Phone: 5197382286
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Erie Shores Healthcare Hospital
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N9
Phone: (519) 326-2373
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Aug 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 24 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Georgia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laba-Kaczmarek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jan 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Laba-Kaczmarek (CPSO#: 97190 )
Business Address: 1 Pollard Drive
Essex Ontario N0R 1G0
(519) 738-2286
Business Address: Leamington District
Memorial Hosptail
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N9
(519) 322-2501
Business Address: 32 Munger Avenue West
PO Box 100
Essex Ontario N0R 1G0
(519) 738-3555

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 32 Munger Avenue West
Harrow ON N0R 1G0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 738-3555
Fax: (519) 738-3990
Address: 1 Pollard drive
Harrow Ontario N0R1G0
Phone: 5197382286
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Erie Shores Healthcare Hospital
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N9
Phone: (519) 326-2373
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Aug 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 24 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Georgia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laba-Kaczmarek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jan 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Laba-Kaczmarek (CPSO#: 97190 )
Business Address: 1 Pollard Drive
Essex Ontario N0R 1G0
(519) 738-2286
Business Address: Leamington District
Memorial Hosptail
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N9
(519) 322-2501
Business Address: 32 Munger Avenue West
PO Box 100
Essex Ontario N0R 1G0
(519) 738-3555

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JESSICA ANNE LABA-KACZMAREK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LABA-KACZMAREK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JESSICA ANNE LABA-KACZMAREK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LABA-KACZMAREK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Dec 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 17 Nov 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 Nov 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 04 Oct 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 30 Sep 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 23 May 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2012
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2014

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 04 Oct 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 23 May 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2012