THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:21:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Retina Centre of Ottawa
2211 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2B 7E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 226-7061
Fax: (613) 226-7065

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thomas K. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 May 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Lee (CPSO#: 97211 )
Business Address: Retina Centre of Ottawa
2211 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2B 7E9
(613) 226-7061

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Retina Centre of Ottawa
2211 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2B 7E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 226-7061
Fax: (613) 226-7065

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thomas K. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 May 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Lee (CPSO#: 97211 )
Business Address: Retina Centre of Ottawa
2211 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2B 7E9
(613) 226-7061

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THOMAS KIN MAN LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THOMAS KIN MAN LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2012
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jan 2012