THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:20:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St.Christopher Iba Mar Diop Col of Med, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101 Erie Street East
Windsor Ontario N9A 3W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 254-2999
Fax: (519) 254-4999
Address: Erie Shores Healthcare
194 Talbot St W
Department of Internal Medicine
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1995 Lens Ave
Windsor Regional Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
Windsor ON N8W 1L9
Phone: 519-254-5577
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor Regional Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
Windsor ON N9A 1E1
Phone: 519-973-4411
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 20 Jan 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 20 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Abu-Rashed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Apr 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Abu-Rashed (CPSO#: 97221 )
Business Address: Unit 5
130 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 1L9
(519) 250-4449
Business Address: 101 Erie Street East
Windsor Ontario N9A 3W9
(519) 254-2999
Business Address: 250 Tecumseh Road East
Suite 110
Windsor Ontario N8X 2R3
(519) 971-2901
Business Address: 207 - 13278 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh Ontario N8N 3T6
(519) 735-0077

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: St.Christopher Iba Mar Diop Col of Med, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101 Erie Street East
Windsor Ontario N9A 3W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 254-2999
Fax: (519) 254-4999
Address: Erie Shores Healthcare
194 Talbot St W
Department of Internal Medicine
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1995 Lens Ave
Windsor Regional Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
Windsor ON N8W 1L9
Phone: 519-254-5577
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor Regional Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
Windsor ON N9A 1E1
Phone: 519-973-4411
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 20 Jan 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 20 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Abu-Rashed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Apr 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Abu-Rashed (CPSO#: 97221 )
Business Address: Unit 5
130 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 1L9
(519) 250-4449
Business Address: 101 Erie Street East
Windsor Ontario N9A 3W9
(519) 254-2999
Business Address: 250 Tecumseh Road East
Suite 110
Windsor Ontario N8X 2R3
(519) 971-2901
Business Address: 207 - 13278 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh Ontario N8N 3T6
(519) 735-0077

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
26 Mar 2021
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 26 2021
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Kamal Ahmad Abu-Rashed may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Kamal Ahmad Abu-Rashed may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St.Christopher Iba Mar Diop Col of Med, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 26 Mar 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 03 Jun 2019
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 21 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 26 Mar 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jan 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Jan 2012