THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:37:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Kasturba Medical College, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Niagara Region Medical
8279 Lundy's Lane
Unit A3/A4
Niagara Falls Ontario L2H 1H5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 357-1661
Fax: (905) 371-9090
Address: 35 Upper Centennial Pkwy
Stoney Creek Ontario L8J 3W2
Phone: 905-662-3885
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 15 Oct 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR VIPUL JAIN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Jain (CPSO#: 97236 )
Business Address: 8279 Lundy's Lane
UNIT 4
Niagara Falls Ontario L2H 1H5
9053571661
Business Address: 35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Hamilton Ontario L8J 3W2

Corporation Name: Dr. Vipul Jain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Jun 2024

Corporation Name: Dr. Vipul Jain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Apr 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Kasturba Medical College, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Niagara Region Medical
8279 Lundy's Lane
Unit A3/A4
Niagara Falls Ontario L2H 1H5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 357-1661
Fax: (905) 371-9090
Address: 35 Upper Centennial Pkwy
Stoney Creek Ontario L8J 3W2
Phone: 905-662-3885
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 15 Oct 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR VIPUL JAIN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Jain (CPSO#: 97236 )
Business Address: 8279 Lundy's Lane
UNIT 4
Niagara Falls Ontario L2H 1H5
9053571661
Business Address: 35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Hamilton Ontario L8J 3W2

Corporation Name: Dr. Vipul Jain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Jun 2024

Corporation Name: Dr. Vipul Jain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Apr 2021

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
21 Sep 2016
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 21 2016
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Vipul Jain may practise medicine independently in Internal Medicine and
Clinical Immunology and Allergy, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Vipul Jain may practise medicine independently in Internal Medicine and
Clinical Immunology and Allergy, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Kasturba Medical College, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 May 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 02 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Nov 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 08 Apr 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 May 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 May 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 08 Apr 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Feb 2012