THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/04/25 13:00:59 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MALAY

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: E6-220
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Rd E, London
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Extension: 58342
Fax: (519) 685-8294

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 30 Oct 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.W. Phua Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jul 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Phua (CPSO#: 97252 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MALAY
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: E6-220
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Rd E, London
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Extension: 58342
Fax: (519) 685-8294

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 30 Oct 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.W. Phua Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jul 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Phua (CPSO#: 97252 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHAI WYE PHUA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHUA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHAI WYE PHUA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHUA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Mar 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Feb 2012