THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/04/25 18:41:23 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Thunder Bay Paediatrics
104-1260 Golf Links Rd
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B0A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 766-3370
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Linda Bakovic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Bakovic (CPSO#: 97305 )
Business Address: 104-1260 Golf Links Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 0A1
(807) 766-3370

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Thunder Bay Paediatrics
104-1260 Golf Links Rd
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B0A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 766-3370
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Linda Bakovic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Bakovic (CPSO#: 97305 )
Business Address: 104-1260 Golf Links Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 0A1
(807) 766-3370

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINDA JANINA BAKOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKOVIC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINDA JANINA BAKOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKOVIC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 08 Apr 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Nov 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 08 Apr 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Mar 2012