THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:22:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7160 Markham Rd
Markham ON L3S 3J8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Sep 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 03 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mujtaba Ali Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khan (CPSO#: 97368 )
Business Address: 59 Canoe Cres
Scarborough ON M1X 1X8
3065405208
Business Address: 7160 Markham Rd
Markham ON L3S 3J8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7160 Markham Rd
Markham ON L3S 3J8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Sep 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 03 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mujtaba Ali Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khan (CPSO#: 97368 )
Business Address: 59 Canoe Cres
Scarborough ON M1X 1X8
3065405208
Business Address: 7160 Markham Rd
Markham ON L3S 3J8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MUJTABA ALI KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MUJTABA ALI KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Karachi, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2012
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Mar 2012