THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:14:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Vaughan Paediatric Clinic
Suite 310
8333 Weston Road
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 8E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 850-3250
Fax: 9058505607

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 29 Mar 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 29 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Chmiel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Chmiel (CPSO#: 97381 )
Business Address: Vaughan Paediatric Clinic
Suite 310
8333 Weston Road
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 8E2
(905) 850-3250

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Vaughan Paediatric Clinic
Suite 310
8333 Weston Road
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 8E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 850-3250
Fax: 9058505607

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 29 Mar 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 29 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Chmiel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Chmiel (CPSO#: 97381 )
Business Address: Vaughan Paediatric Clinic
Suite 310
8333 Weston Road
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 8E2
(905) 850-3250

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
25 Sep 2013
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 25 2013
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Peter Konrad Chmiel may practise medicine independently in
paediatrics in an office-based setting, only.


VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Peter Konrad Chmiel may practise medicine independently in
paediatrics in an office-based setting, only.


Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 Sep 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 25 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2013

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Mar 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Mar 2012