THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:04:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, INDONESIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 494-6221
Fax: (905) 494-6717

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 16 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Tjandrawidjaja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 May 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tjandrawidjaja (CPSO#: 97487 )
Business Address: William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-6221

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, INDONESIAN
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 494-6221
Fax: (905) 494-6717

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 16 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Tjandrawidjaja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 May 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tjandrawidjaja (CPSO#: 97487 )
Business Address: William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-6221

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL CLARENCE TJANDRAWIDJAJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TJANDRAWIDJAJA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL CLARENCE TJANDRAWIDJAJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TJANDRAWIDJAJA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 25 Jun 2018
Summary of Decision:
On June 25, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Michael Clarence Tjandrawidjaja committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

Dr. Tjandrawidjaja is a physician who currently practises as a cardiologist in Brampton. He received his certificate of registration authorizing independent practice in Ontario in 2012. At the time of the incidents described below, Dr. Tjandrawidjaja was a member of the Ontario Medical Association (“OMA”), the association that represents the political and economic interests of physicians in Ontario. It is the exclusive representative of Ontario physicians in negotiations with the Province of Ontario.

Tentative Physician Services Agreement (“tPSA”)

On July 11, 2016, the OMA and the Ontario government reached a tentative agreement dealing with government funding for physician services and changes to the physician fee schedule, among other issues, tPSA. The tPSA was to have a term of four years, and would have replaced a previous agreement, which terminated in 2014. The tPSA was endorsed by the OMA’s Board, including by Dr. Virginia Walley, who was President of the OMA at the time. The OMA promoted the agreement in the weeks leading up to a General Meeting, which took place on August 14, 2016. On August 14, 2016, the OMA membership voted to reject the tPSA.

Dr. Tjandrawidjaja’s email of July 31 and August 8, 2016

On July 30, 2016, OMA members received an email providing information regarding an upcoming vote to ratify the tPSA. The email encouraged members to vote in favour of the agreement. It was sent from an email address used by OMA staff to communicate publicly about the tPSA, and was signed by Dr. Walley. On July 31, 2016, Dr. Tjandrawidjaja replied by sending the following email to Dr. Walley: “You are a turd”. On August 8, 2016, Dr. Tjandrawidjaja sent the following email directly to Dr. Walley’s personal email address: “Virginia, how much are the liberals bribing you? It will likely come out at some point.” The emails sent by Dr. Tjandrawidjaja were viewed by Dr. Walley as well as OMA staff who monitored the tPSA email address.

Dr. Tjandrawidjaja’s response during investigation

Dr. Tjandrawidjaja provided a response during the investigation, acknowledging the emails were inappropriate, stating that he regretted sending them, and indicating he wished to apologize to Dr Walley, among other things. In November 2017, Dr. Tjandrawidjaja completed 4.5 hours of one-on- one Professional Communication coaching with Dawn Martin, Communications Specialist and Educational Consultant, to develop skills related to professional communication and collaboration with colleagues.

Disposition

On June 25, 2018, the Committee ordered and directed that:

- Dr. Tjandrawidjaja appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
- Dr. Tjandrawidjaja pay to the College its costs of this proceeding in the amount of $6,000 within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order.
 
 
Hearing Date(s): June 25, 2018

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 25 Jun 2018
Summary of Decision:
On June 25, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Michael Clarence Tjandrawidjaja committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

Dr. Tjandrawidjaja is a physician who currently practises as a cardiologist in Brampton. He received his certificate of registration authorizing independent practice in Ontario in 2012. At the time of the incidents described below, Dr. Tjandrawidjaja was a member of the Ontario Medical Association (“OMA”), the association that represents the political and economic interests of physicians in Ontario. It is the exclusive representative of Ontario physicians in negotiations with the Province of Ontario.

Tentative Physician Services Agreement (“tPSA”)

On July 11, 2016, the OMA and the Ontario government reached a tentative agreement dealing with government funding for physician services and changes to the physician fee schedule, among other issues, tPSA. The tPSA was to have a term of four years, and would have replaced a previous agreement, which terminated in 2014. The tPSA was endorsed by the OMA’s Board, including by Dr. Virginia Walley, who was President of the OMA at the time. The OMA promoted the agreement in the weeks leading up to a General Meeting, which took place on August 14, 2016. On August 14, 2016, the OMA membership voted to reject the tPSA.

Dr. Tjandrawidjaja’s email of July 31 and August 8, 2016

On July 30, 2016, OMA members received an email providing information regarding an upcoming vote to ratify the tPSA. The email encouraged members to vote in favour of the agreement. It was sent from an email address used by OMA staff to communicate publicly about the tPSA, and was signed by Dr. Walley. On July 31, 2016, Dr. Tjandrawidjaja replied by sending the following email to Dr. Walley: “You are a turd”. On August 8, 2016, Dr. Tjandrawidjaja sent the following email directly to Dr. Walley’s personal email address: “Virginia, how much are the liberals bribing you? It will likely come out at some point.” The emails sent by Dr. Tjandrawidjaja were viewed by Dr. Walley as well as OMA staff who monitored the tPSA email address.

Dr. Tjandrawidjaja’s response during investigation

Dr. Tjandrawidjaja provided a response during the investigation, acknowledging the emails were inappropriate, stating that he regretted sending them, and indicating he wished to apologize to Dr Walley, among other things. In November 2017, Dr. Tjandrawidjaja completed 4.5 hours of one-on- one Professional Communication coaching with Dawn Martin, Communications Specialist and Educational Consultant, to develop skills related to professional communication and collaboration with colleagues.

Disposition

On June 25, 2018, the Committee ordered and directed that:

- Dr. Tjandrawidjaja appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
- Dr. Tjandrawidjaja pay to the College its costs of this proceeding in the amount of $6,000 within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order.
 
 
Hearing Date(s): June 25, 2018

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 2012
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 May 2012