THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:21:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Xavier University School of Medicine, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 3
1015 Golf Links Rd
Ancaster Ontario L9K1L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 304-8001
Fax: (289) 426-0833

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Nov 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yasinian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jun 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Yasinian (CPSO#: 97488 )
Business Address: Unit 3
1015 Golflinks Road
Ancaster Ontario L9K 1L6
(905) 304-8001

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Xavier University School of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 3
1015 Golf Links Rd
Ancaster Ontario L9K1L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 304-8001
Fax: (289) 426-0833

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Nov 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yasinian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jun 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Yasinian (CPSO#: 97488 )
Business Address: Unit 3
1015 Golflinks Road
Ancaster Ontario L9K 1L6
(905) 304-8001

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
20 Nov 2014
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 20 2014
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Azadeh Yasmin Yasinian may practise medicine independently in family
medicine, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Azadeh Yasmin Yasinian may practise medicine independently in family
medicine, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Xavier University School of Medicine, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Aug 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 May 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 May 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 May 2012