THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:50:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1967 Riverside Drive
Riverside Academic Family Health Team
Ottawa Ontario K1H 1B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137388219
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Jul 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 03 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Osmaan Sheikh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Sheikh (CPSO#: 97493 )
Business Address: 1967 Riverside Drive
Riverside Academic Family Health Team
Ottawa Ontario K1H 1B9
6137388219

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1967 Riverside Drive
Riverside Academic Family Health Team
Ottawa Ontario K1H 1B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137388219
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Jul 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 03 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Osmaan Sheikh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Sheikh (CPSO#: 97493 )
Business Address: 1967 Riverside Drive
Riverside Academic Family Health Team
Ottawa Ontario K1H 1B9
6137388219

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OSMAAN SHEIKH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEIKH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OSMAAN SHEIKH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEIKH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2023
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 05 May 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 May 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 05 May 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jan 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 May 2012