THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:59:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Barrie Paediatric Associates
Suite 302
5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 728-3766
Fax: (705) 728-3757

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pier Diane Glaude Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Mar 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Glaude (CPSO#: 97509 )
Business Address: Barrie Paediatric Associates
Suite 302
5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
(705) 728-3766
Business Address: Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
(705) 728-9090

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Barrie Paediatric Associates
Suite 302
5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 728-3766
Fax: (705) 728-3757

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pier Diane Glaude Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Mar 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Glaude (CPSO#: 97509 )
Business Address: Barrie Paediatric Associates
Suite 302
5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
(705) 728-3766
Business Address: Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
(705) 728-9090

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PIER DIANE GLAUDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GLAUDE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PIER DIANE GLAUDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GLAUDE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 06 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 Jul 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 06 Mar 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 2012