THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 02:27:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical Academy of Latvia, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3030 Birchmount Rd
Scarborough ON M1W 3W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-495-2400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 22 Oct 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 22 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. P. Thamilvaanan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Thamilvaanan (CPSO#: 97510 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: Medical Academy of Latvia, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3030 Birchmount Rd
Scarborough ON M1W 3W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-495-2400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 22 Oct 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 22 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. P. Thamilvaanan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Thamilvaanan (CPSO#: 97510 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PARAMANATHAN THAMILVAANAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THAMILVAANAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PARAMANATHAN THAMILVAANAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THAMILVAANAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical Academy of Latvia, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Nov 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 May 2012