THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:33:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: Malhotra, Ashley Raj (Used Until: 10 Sep 2020) Malhotra, Ashley Raj (Used Until: 09 Oct 2012)
Medical School: University of Birmingham, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2951 Walkers Line
Burlington Ontario L7M4Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-592-3946
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jan 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 07 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Qaderi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Apr 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Qaderi (CPSO#: 97525 )
Business Address: 2951 Walkers Line
Burlington Ontario L7M 4Y1
(905) 592-3946

General Information

Former Name: Malhotra, Ashley Raj (Used Until: 10 Sep 2020) Malhotra, Ashley Raj (Used Until: 09 Oct 2012)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Birmingham, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2951 Walkers Line
Burlington Ontario L7M4Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-592-3946
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jan 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 07 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Qaderi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Apr 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Qaderi (CPSO#: 97525 )
Business Address: 2951 Walkers Line
Burlington Ontario L7M 4Y1
(905) 592-3946

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASHLEY RAJ QADERI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QADERI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASHLEY RAJ QADERI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QADERI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Birmingham, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Jan 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Feb 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 2012