THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:15:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Nephrology
CNIB Kidney Centre
1929 Bayview Avenue, Suite 370
Toronto Ontario M4G 3E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-480-6100
Extension: 5590
Fax: 416-480-5180

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 27 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bourne Auguste Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Auguste (CPSO#: 97551 )
Business Address: 370 - 1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4G 3E8
(416) 480-5590

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Nephrology
CNIB Kidney Centre
1929 Bayview Avenue, Suite 370
Toronto Ontario M4G 3E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-480-6100
Extension: 5590
Fax: 416-480-5180

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 27 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bourne Auguste Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Auguste (CPSO#: 97551 )
Business Address: 370 - 1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4G 3E8
(416) 480-5590

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BOURNE LEWIS ADRIAN AUGUSTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUGUSTE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BOURNE LEWIS ADRIAN AUGUSTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUGUSTE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012