THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:26:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: New Vision Family Health Team
421 Greenbrook Drive, Unit 23B
Kitchener Ontario N2M 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 578-3510
Fax: (519) 578-6040

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rosemarie Noble Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Noble (CPSO#: 97561 )
Business Address: New Vision Family Health Team
23B - 421 Greenbrook Drive
Kitchener Ontario N2M 4K1
(519) 578-3510

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: New Vision Family Health Team
421 Greenbrook Drive, Unit 23B
Kitchener Ontario N2M 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 578-3510
Fax: (519) 578-6040

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rosemarie Noble Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Noble (CPSO#: 97561 )
Business Address: New Vision Family Health Team
23B - 421 Greenbrook Drive
Kitchener Ontario N2M 4K1
(519) 578-3510

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROSEMARIE NOBLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOBLE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROSEMARIE NOBLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOBLE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012