THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:47:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 444 Douro Street, 2nd Floor
Stratford Ontario N5A 0E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-271-7172
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nicola Crawford Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Mar 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Crawford (CPSO#: 97567 )
Business Address: 444 Douro St
Stratford ON N5A 0E6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 444 Douro Street, 2nd Floor
Stratford Ontario N5A 0E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-271-7172
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nicola Crawford Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Mar 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Crawford (CPSO#: 97567 )
Business Address: 444 Douro St
Stratford ON N5A 0E6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLA ANDREA CRAWFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRAWFORD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLA ANDREA CRAWFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRAWFORD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012