THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:41:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Niagara North Family Health Team
9-605 Glenridge Ave
St. Catharines ON L2T 4E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905.685.8700
Fax: 905.988.1616

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Danya Al-Baldawi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Nov 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Al-Baldawi (CPSO#: 97570 )
Business Address: 9-605 Glenridge Ave
St Catharines ON L2T 4E6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Niagara North Family Health Team
9-605 Glenridge Ave
St. Catharines ON L2T 4E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905.685.8700
Fax: 905.988.1616

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Danya Al-Baldawi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Nov 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Al-Baldawi (CPSO#: 97570 )
Business Address: 9-605 Glenridge Ave
St Catharines ON L2T 4E6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANYA AL-BALDAWI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-BALDAWI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANYA AL-BALDAWI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-BALDAWI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012