THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:29:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University, Suite 942
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Extension: 1559
Fax: (416) 586-8596

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Benjamin Rosen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Rosen (CPSO#: 97574 )
Business Address: 600 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University, Suite 942
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Extension: 1559
Fax: (416) 586-8596

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Benjamin Rosen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Rosen (CPSO#: 97574 )
Business Address: 600 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BENJAMIN FRED ROSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BENJAMIN FRED ROSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 29 Apr 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Jan 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012