THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 08:52:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1280 Main St W
PGCLL 201/210
McMaster University
Student Wellness Centre
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 525-9140
Extension: 27700
Fax: 1-855-683-4077

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cicero Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Mar 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Martorelli (CPSO#: 97583 ) Dr. M. Cicero (CPSO#: 97543 )
Business Address: McMaster University
Student Wellness Centre
MUSC B101
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4S4
(905) 525-9140
Business Address: 751 Victoria Street South
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5N4
(519) 742-2636

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1280 Main St W
PGCLL 201/210
McMaster University
Student Wellness Centre
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 525-9140
Extension: 27700
Fax: 1-855-683-4077

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cicero Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Mar 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Martorelli (CPSO#: 97583 ) Dr. M. Cicero (CPSO#: 97543 )
Business Address: McMaster University
Student Wellness Centre
MUSC B101
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4S4
(905) 525-9140
Business Address: 751 Victoria Street South
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5N4
(519) 742-2636

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTINA MARIE MARTORELLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTORELLI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTINA MARIE MARTORELLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTORELLI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012