THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:38:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Clinique Ophtalmologique
de l'Outaouais
29 rue Ducharme
Gatineau Quebec J8Y 3P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (819) 771-6015
Fax: 819-484-0168
Address: 10-407 Laurier Ave W
Ottawa ON K1R 7Y7
Phone: 1(613) 288-2020
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephanie Chan Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chan (CPSO#: 97585 )
Business Address: Clinique Ophtalmologique
de l'Outaouais
29 rue Ducharme
Gatineau Quebec J8Y 3P7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Clinique Ophtalmologique
de l'Outaouais
29 rue Ducharme
Gatineau Quebec J8Y 3P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (819) 771-6015
Fax: 819-484-0168
Address: 10-407 Laurier Ave W
Ottawa ON K1R 7Y7
Phone: 1(613) 288-2020
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephanie Chan Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chan (CPSO#: 97585 )
Business Address: Clinique Ophtalmologique
de l'Outaouais
29 rue Ducharme
Gatineau Quebec J8Y 3P7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHANIE CHUNG YAN CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHANIE CHUNG YAN CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012