THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:24:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room H158
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-480-4760
Fax: 416-480-6875

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 26 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Angela Assal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Apr 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Assal (CPSO#: 97588 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room H121
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6056

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room H158
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-480-4760
Fax: 416-480-6875

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 26 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Angela Assal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Apr 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Assal (CPSO#: 97588 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room H121
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6056

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANGELA FRANCES ASSAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASSAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANGELA FRANCES ASSAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASSAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012