THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:04:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Hospital
Emergency Department
c/o ED Admin Office Rm 1358
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-813-4530
Fax: 905-813-4548

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alexander Chorley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chorley (CPSO#: 97599 )
Business Address: Hamilton General Hospital
Division of Emergency Medicine
Room 2-11
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 527-4322 Extn: 46368
Business Address: 100 Queensway W
Mississauga Hospital
Emergency Department
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Hospital
Emergency Department
c/o ED Admin Office Rm 1358
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-813-4530
Fax: 905-813-4548

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alexander Chorley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chorley (CPSO#: 97599 )
Business Address: Hamilton General Hospital
Division of Emergency Medicine
Room 2-11
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 527-4322 Extn: 46368
Business Address: 100 Queensway W
Mississauga Hospital
Emergency Department
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDER GARRICK CHORLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHORLEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDER GARRICK CHORLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHORLEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 30 May 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 30 May 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012