THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:16:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 105 Clappison Avenue
Unit
Hamilton Ontario L8B 0Y2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-689-3301
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Heather McCarrel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jan 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. H. McCarrel (CPSO#: 97604 )
Business Address: Carlisle Medical Centre
1493 Centre Road
PO Box 311
Carlisle Ontario L0R 1H0
(905) 689-3301

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 105 Clappison Avenue
Unit
Hamilton Ontario L8B 0Y2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-689-3301
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Heather McCarrel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jan 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. H. McCarrel (CPSO#: 97604 )
Business Address: Carlisle Medical Centre
1493 Centre Road
PO Box 311
Carlisle Ontario L0R 1H0
(905) 689-3301

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEATHER ELIZABETH MCCARREL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCARREL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEATHER ELIZABETH MCCARREL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCARREL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012