THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:38:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Humber River Hospital
Dept of Hematology
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Extension: 21300
Fax: 416-242-1073
Address: 2221 Keele St
Suite 305
Toronto Ontario M6M 3Z5
Phone: 416-748-5999
Fax: 416-748-6127

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 03 Nov 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vighnesh Bharath Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Apr 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Bharath (CPSO#: 97610 )
Business Address: 305 - 2221 Keele St.
Toronto Ontario M6M 3Z5
(416) 748-5999
Business Address: Humber River Hospital
Department of Hematology
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
(416) 242-1000 Extn: 21300

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Humber River Hospital
Dept of Hematology
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Extension: 21300
Fax: 416-242-1073
Address: 2221 Keele St
Suite 305
Toronto Ontario M6M 3Z5
Phone: 416-748-5999
Fax: 416-748-6127

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 03 Nov 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vighnesh Bharath Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Apr 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Bharath (CPSO#: 97610 )
Business Address: 305 - 2221 Keele St.
Toronto Ontario M6M 3Z5
(416) 748-5999
Business Address: Humber River Hospital
Department of Hematology
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
(416) 242-1000 Extn: 21300

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VIGHNESH BHARATH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHARATH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VIGHNESH BHARATH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHARATH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012