THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:42:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karim Vellani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Aug 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Vellani (CPSO#: 97637 )
Business Address: 320-2310 St. Laurent Blvd
Ottawa ON K1G 5H9
1-844-725-4345
Business Address: St Michaels Hospital
Family Practice Unit
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 867-7428
Business Address: Suite 212
2 Toronto Street
Toronto Ontario M5C 2B5
(647) 873-8936

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karim Vellani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Aug 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Vellani (CPSO#: 97637 )
Business Address: 320-2310 St. Laurent Blvd
Ottawa ON K1G 5H9
1-844-725-4345
Business Address: St Michaels Hospital
Family Practice Unit
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 867-7428
Business Address: Suite 212
2 Toronto Street
Toronto Ontario M5C 2B5
(647) 873-8936

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KARIM VELLANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VELLANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KARIM VELLANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VELLANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012