THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:50:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 525 Belmont Avenue West
Unit #104
Kitchener ON N2M 5E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-666-2404
Fax: 519-340-2057
Address: 310 King St E
Sanctuary Refugee Health Centre
Suite # 203
Kitchener ON N2G 2L3
Phone: 226-336-1321
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: El-Assar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. D. El-Assar (CPSO#: 97647 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 525 Belmont Avenue West
Unit #104
Kitchener ON N2M 5E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-666-2404
Fax: 519-340-2057
Address: 310 King St E
Sanctuary Refugee Health Centre
Suite # 203
Kitchener ON N2G 2L3
Phone: 226-336-1321
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: El-Assar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. D. El-Assar (CPSO#: 97647 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DALIA SHABAN DAWOUD EL-ASSAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-ASSAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DALIA SHABAN DAWOUD EL-ASSAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-ASSAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012