THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:22:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Vladivostok State Medical University, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
Department of Laboratory Medicine
170 Colborne St. West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 325-2201
Extension: 3057
Fax: (705) 330-3225

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Carrigan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Oct 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Carrigan (CPSO#: 97652 )
Business Address: Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
Department of Laboratory Medicine
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
(705) 325-2201 Extn: 3057

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Vladivostok State Medical University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
Department of Laboratory Medicine
170 Colborne St. West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 325-2201
Extension: 3057
Fax: (705) 330-3225

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Carrigan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Oct 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Carrigan (CPSO#: 97652 )
Business Address: Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
Department of Laboratory Medicine
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
(705) 325-2201 Extn: 3057

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SVETLANA OLEGOVNA CARRIGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARRIGAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SVETLANA OLEGOVNA CARRIGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARRIGAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Vladivostok State Medical University, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012