THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:56:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 375 2nd Ave
North Island Hospital Campbell River & District
Emergency Department
Campbell River BC V9W 3V1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (250) 286-7100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Oct 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 08 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Wilson Memorial General Hospital Marathon
La Verendrye Hospital Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital Red Lake
Atikokan Health and Community Services Atikokan
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Sante Manitouwadge Health Manitouwadge
HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: McCausland Hospital
LOCATION: Terrace Bay

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Wilson Memorial General Hospital
LOCATION: Marathon

HOSPITAL: La Verendrye Hospital Riverside Health Care Facilities
LOCATION: Fort Frances

HOSPITAL: Geraldton District Hospital
LOCATION: Geraldton

HOSPITAL: Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Red Lake

HOSPITAL: Atikokan Health and Community Services
LOCATION: Atikokan

HOSPITAL: Nipigon District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Nipigon

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

HOSPITAL: Sante Manitouwadge Health
LOCATION: Manitouwadge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zroback Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Nov 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Zroback (CPSO#: 97667 )
Business Address: 212 Fourth Ave S
Waasegiizhig Nanaandawe'iyewigamig
Kenora ON P9N 1Y9
Business Address: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
21 Sylvan Street
Kenora Ontario P9N 3W7
(807) 468-9861

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 375 2nd Ave
North Island Hospital Campbell River & District
Emergency Department
Campbell River BC V9W 3V1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (250) 286-7100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Oct 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 08 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Wilson Memorial General Hospital Marathon
La Verendrye Hospital Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital Red Lake
Atikokan Health and Community Services Atikokan
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Sante Manitouwadge Health Manitouwadge
HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: McCausland Hospital
LOCATION: Terrace Bay

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Wilson Memorial General Hospital
LOCATION: Marathon

HOSPITAL: La Verendrye Hospital Riverside Health Care Facilities
LOCATION: Fort Frances

HOSPITAL: Geraldton District Hospital
LOCATION: Geraldton

HOSPITAL: Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Red Lake

HOSPITAL: Atikokan Health and Community Services
LOCATION: Atikokan

HOSPITAL: Nipigon District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Nipigon

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

HOSPITAL: Sante Manitouwadge Health
LOCATION: Manitouwadge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zroback Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Nov 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Zroback (CPSO#: 97667 )
Business Address: 212 Fourth Ave S
Waasegiizhig Nanaandawe'iyewigamig
Kenora ON P9N 1Y9
Business Address: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
21 Sylvan Street
Kenora Ontario P9N 3W7
(807) 468-9861

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JESSE PETER ZROBACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZROBACK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JESSE PETER ZROBACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZROBACK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012