THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 04:16:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Six Nations Family Health Team
White Pines Wellness Centre
First Floor
1745 Chiefswood Road
Ohsweken Ontario N0A 1M0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 445-4019
Fax: (519) 445-1917
Address: Nurture North MAR Clinic
239 Main Street East
North Bay Ontario P1B 1B2
Phone: (705) 478-7197
Fax: (705) 478-0861
Address: Shkagamik-Kwe Health Centre
161 Applegrove Street
Sudbury Ontario P3C 1N2
Phone: (705) 675-1596
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Melissa A.C. Shigwadja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shigwadja (CPSO#: 97686 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Six Nations Family Health Team
White Pines Wellness Centre
First Floor
1745 Chiefswood Road
Ohsweken Ontario N0A 1M0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 445-4019
Fax: (519) 445-1917
Address: Nurture North MAR Clinic
239 Main Street East
North Bay Ontario P1B 1B2
Phone: (705) 478-7197
Fax: (705) 478-0861
Address: Shkagamik-Kwe Health Centre
161 Applegrove Street
Sudbury Ontario P3C 1N2
Phone: (705) 675-1596
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Melissa A.C. Shigwadja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shigwadja (CPSO#: 97686 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELISSA ANNE CECILIA SHIGWADJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIGWADJA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELISSA ANNE CECILIA SHIGWADJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIGWADJA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012