THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:14:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: SUITE 302
345 Lakeshore Rd E
Oakville Ontario L6J 1J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 842-2888
Fax: (905) 842-5316
Address: 1910 St Laurent Blvd #18
Ottawa Ontario K1G 1A4
Phone: (613) 523-5550
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 103-311 McArthur Ave
Vanier Ontario K1L 8M3
Phone: (613) 749-1678
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M.A. Wahab Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 May 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khan (CPSO#: 97687 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: SUITE 302
345 Lakeshore Rd E
Oakville Ontario L6J 1J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 842-2888
Fax: (905) 842-5316
Address: 1910 St Laurent Blvd #18
Ottawa Ontario K1G 1A4
Phone: (613) 523-5550
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 103-311 McArthur Ave
Vanier Ontario K1L 8M3
Phone: (613) 749-1678
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M.A. Wahab Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 May 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khan (CPSO#: 97687 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMED ABDUL WAHAB KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMED ABDUL WAHAB KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012