THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:42:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 180 Cambria Rd N
Maitland Valley Family Health Team
Goderich ON N7A 4N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 04 Nov 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Huron Perth Healthcare Alliance Stratford
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
HOSPITAL: Huron Perth Healthcare Alliance
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: Wingham and District Hospital
LOCATION: Wingham

HOSPITAL: Listowel Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Listowel

HOSPITAL: Seaforth Community Hospital
LOCATION: Seaforth

HOSPITAL: Clinton Public Hospital
LOCATION: Clinton

HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
LOCATION: Goderich

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. M. Steinmann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Steinmann (CPSO#: 97691 )
Business Address: 120 Napier Street
Goderich Ontario N7A 1W5
Business Address: Maitland Valley Family Health Team
180 Cambria Road North
Goderich Ontario N7A 4E2
(519) 524-6060

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 180 Cambria Rd N
Maitland Valley Family Health Team
Goderich ON N7A 4N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 04 Nov 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Huron Perth Healthcare Alliance Stratford
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
HOSPITAL: Huron Perth Healthcare Alliance
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: Wingham and District Hospital
LOCATION: Wingham

HOSPITAL: Listowel Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Listowel

HOSPITAL: Seaforth Community Hospital
LOCATION: Seaforth

HOSPITAL: Clinton Public Hospital
LOCATION: Clinton

HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
LOCATION: Goderich

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. M. Steinmann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Steinmann (CPSO#: 97691 )
Business Address: 120 Napier Street
Goderich Ontario N7A 1W5
Business Address: Maitland Valley Family Health Team
180 Cambria Road North
Goderich Ontario N7A 4E2
(519) 524-6060

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAMRA MARIAN STEINMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEINMANN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAMRA MARIAN STEINMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEINMANN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012