THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:18:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 901 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 3K6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4168640722
Fax: 4168649742

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Zein Faraj Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Faraj (CPSO#: 97693 )
Business Address: 11 King Street West
PO Box 6
2nd Floor
Toronto Ontario M5H 4C7
(416) 864-0722
Business Address: 901 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 3K6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 901 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 3K6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4168640722
Fax: 4168649742

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Zein Faraj Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Faraj (CPSO#: 97693 )
Business Address: 11 King Street West
PO Box 6
2nd Floor
Toronto Ontario M5H 4C7
(416) 864-0722
Business Address: 901 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 3K6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZEIN FARAJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARAJ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZEIN FARAJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARAJ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012