THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:03:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 35 Albert St W
Thorold ON L2V 2G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-935-0312
Fax: 905-935-2949
Address: Niagara Health - St. Catherines
1200 Fourth Ave
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Oct 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jasmine Lamba Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lamba (CPSO#: 97715 )
Business Address: 1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON L2S 0A9
9053784647

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 35 Albert St W
Thorold ON L2V 2G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-935-0312
Fax: 905-935-2949
Address: Niagara Health - St. Catherines
1200 Fourth Ave
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Oct 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jasmine Lamba Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lamba (CPSO#: 97715 )
Business Address: 1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON L2S 0A9
9053784647

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASMINE KOMAL LAMBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAMBA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASMINE KOMAL LAMBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAMBA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012