THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 02:52:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth St
Toronto General Hospital
Emergency Department
Room 480
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3856
Fax: (416) 340-4300

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 22 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H.M. Sheikh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Sheikh (CPSO#: 97717 )
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
R. Fraser Elliot Building - Room 480
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-3856

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth St
Toronto General Hospital
Emergency Department
Room 480
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3856
Fax: (416) 340-4300

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 22 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H.M. Sheikh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Sheikh (CPSO#: 97717 )
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
R. Fraser Elliot Building - Room 480
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-3856

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HASAN MUNIR SHEIKH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEIKH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HASAN MUNIR SHEIKH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEIKH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 May 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012