THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 02:51:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital For Sick Children
555 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-7654
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: NAN GAI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Feb 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Gai (CPSO#: 97723 )
Business Address: 555 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital For Sick Children
555 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-7654
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: NAN GAI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Feb 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Gai (CPSO#: 97723 )
Business Address: 555 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAN GAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAN GAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Apr 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012