THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:07:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 200
1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville Ontario L6H 3P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 844-3281
Fax: (905) 849-1076
Address: 456 Trafalgar Road
Oakville Ontario L6J 3H9
Phone: (905) 337-1145
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeremy K. Fong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jul 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Fong (CPSO#: 97724 )
Business Address: 4046 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga Ontario L5L 2W7
(905) 569-0004
Business Address: Suite 200
1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville Ontario L6H 3P1
(905) 844-3281

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 200
1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville Ontario L6H 3P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 844-3281
Fax: (905) 849-1076
Address: 456 Trafalgar Road
Oakville Ontario L6J 3H9
Phone: (905) 337-1145
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeremy K. Fong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jul 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Fong (CPSO#: 97724 )
Business Address: 4046 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga Ontario L5L 2W7
(905) 569-0004
Business Address: Suite 200
1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville Ontario L6H 3P1
(905) 844-3281

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEREMY KING-HENG FONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEREMY KING-HENG FONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012