THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 02:54:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 306-1 Quarry Ridge Rd
Barrie East Family Medicine
Barrie ON L4M 7G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-725-9922
Fax: 705-725-8622

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ALIYARZADEH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Aliyarzadeh (CPSO#: 97734 )
Business Address: 1 Quarry Ridge Rd
Suite 306
Barrie ON L4M 7G1
Business Address: 5 Quarry Ridge Rd
Suite LL1
Barrie ON L4M 7G1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 306-1 Quarry Ridge Rd
Barrie East Family Medicine
Barrie ON L4M 7G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-725-9922
Fax: 705-725-8622

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ALIYARZADEH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Aliyarzadeh (CPSO#: 97734 )
Business Address: 1 Quarry Ridge Rd
Suite 306
Barrie ON L4M 7G1
Business Address: 5 Quarry Ridge Rd
Suite LL1
Barrie ON L4M 7G1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HODA ALIYARZADEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALIYARZADEH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HODA ALIYARZADEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALIYARZADEH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012