THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/04/25 18:24:00 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100-217 Terrace Hill St
Unit 128
Brantford ON N3R 1G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-304-8882
Fax: 519-304-7880

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 15 Jul 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 15 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brantford General Hospital Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brantford General Hospital
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jessica Dooley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Oct 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Dooley (CPSO#: 97784 )
Business Address: 128-217 Terrace Hill St
Brantford ON N3R 1G8
Business Address: 200 Terrace Hill St
Brantford ON N3R 1G9
5197515544

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100-217 Terrace Hill St
Unit 128
Brantford ON N3R 1G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-304-8882
Fax: 519-304-7880

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 15 Jul 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 15 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brantford General Hospital Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brantford General Hospital
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jessica Dooley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Oct 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Dooley (CPSO#: 97784 )
Business Address: 128-217 Terrace Hill St
Brantford ON N3R 1G8
Business Address: 200 Terrace Hill St
Brantford ON N3R 1G9
5197515544

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JESSICA DUNN DOOLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOOLEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JESSICA DUNN DOOLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOOLEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Jul 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012